Saidmuradov Ibodullo Habibulloyevich
Volga Federal District of the Russian Federation
Samara
Mechanical engineering and instrument making
Financial services, investments and audit
Vice chairman of the board
Board member
Previous jobs:
Kazkommertsbank Tajikistan
Chairman of the board
Member of the Supervisory board
Content |
Biography
Education
1986: Tajik polytechnical institute
In 1986 graduated from the Tajik polytechnical institute (since 1997 - the Tajik technical university of M. Osimi), specialty: "Technology of mechanical engineering, metal-cutting machines tools", qualification - the mechanical engineer.
2002: TNPI
In 2002 graduated from the Tajik tax legal institution, specialty: "Taxes and taxation", qualification - the economist - the tax inspector.
Career
2014: Deputy CEO Faroz
From 5/20/2014 to 7/1/2017 - the deputy CEO of Faroz Ltd.
2017
Director of MDO "Faroz Sarmoya"
From 7/1/2017 to 9/18/2017 - the Director of MDO Ltd "Faroz Sarmoya".
Chairman of the board of MKDO "Fardo"
From 9/27/2017 to 1/30/2019 - the Chairman of the board of MKDO Fardo LLC.
From 10/10/2017 to 3/15/2018 - the Acting as the Chairman of the board in connection with conversion of MKDO Fardo LLC to JSC Commerzbank of Tajikistan.
2018: Chairman of the board "Commerzbank of Tajikistan"
From 3/16/2018 to 1/30/2019 - the Chairman of the board Commerzbank Tajikistan of JSC.
From 4/22/2019 to 9/20/2019 - the member of the Supervisory board of JSC Commerzbank of Tajikistan.
2019
Faroz
From 3/1/2019 to 9/10/2019 - the head of Directorate on information technologies of Faroz Ltd.
Development director of CB Solidarnost
From 11/1/2019 to 3/18/2020 - the Development director of JSC CB Solidarnost.
2020: Vice chairman of the board of CB Solidarnost
Since 3/19/2020 - the board member, the vice chairman of the board of JSC CB Solidarnost.