Content |
Biography
In 1987 she graduated from the Perm agricultural Institute. Acting D.N. Pryanishnikov (since 2017 - Perm state Agricultural and Technological University named after Academician D.N. Pryanishnikov), specialty - "Accounting and analysis of economic activities in," agriculture qualification - in economist accounting.
Additional vocational education:
- Diploma in Banking Seminar, Advest, Vienna 1992;
- Business English Certificate, West Language Centre, England 1993
1980: Lenin branch of the State Bank
From 16.01.1980 to 31.12.1987 - economist; Head of Credit Department; manager at the Lenin branch of the State Bank.
1988: Leninsky branch of Promstroybank
From 01.01.1988 to 21.11.1990 - Deputy Manager; manager at the Lenin branch of the USSR Promstroybank in Perm.
1990: Chairman of the Management Board of Bank Perm
Since 22.11.1990 - Chairman of the Board of Bank Perm (JSC).
Since 04.06.1996 - Member of the Board of Directors of Bank Perm (JSC).