Content |
Biography
Education
1989: Sofia university
In 1989 graduated from the Sofia university majoring in English, qualification of the bachelor of the humanities is appropriated.
Career
1989: Sumitomo of Mitsui Benking Corporation
Since 1989 works in the SMBC group and for the career headed different divisions.
From 4/1/2010 to 1/4/2012 held a position of the Deputy chief of Department of planning of the International bank division of Sumitomo Mitsui Benking Corporation (SMBC).
From 1/5/2012 to 4/1/2012 held a position of the Deputy chief of Corporate bank department of II Sumitomo Mitsui Benking Corporation Yurop Limited.
From 4/2/2012 to 3/31/2015 held a position of the Co-manager of Corporate bank department of II Sumitomo Mitsui Benking Corporation Yurop Limited.
2015: Director
From 04.2015 g Direktorom Sumitomo Mitsui Benking Corporation Yurop Limited is the board member.
Operating officer
From 4/1/2015 to 4/1/2018 held a position of the General manager of Department of planning of the European division, the Operating officer.
From 08.2015 g Capital Markets Limited is the board member of SMBC of Nikko.
2018: Chief executive
From 4/2/2018 to 4/30/2020 held a position of the Chief executive, Managing Department of planning of the International bank division of Sumitomo Mitsui Benking Corporation.
2020: Managing director, head of the European division
Since 5/1/2020 holds a position of Upravlyayushchego direktora Sumitomo Mitsui Benking Corporation, the head of the European division of this company and also sole executive body of Sumitomo Mitsui Benking Corporation Yurop Limited.
2015: SMBSR Bank
Since 7/9/2015 - the member of the Supervisory board of JSC SMBSR Bank.
Chairman of the Supervisory board of SMBSR Bank
Since August 19, 2020 it is elected the Chairman of the Supervisory board of JSC SMBSR Bank.