Content |
Biography
In 2003 he graduated from the State University of Management, specialty: management, qualification: manager, specialization: financial management.
Additional education:
- qualification certificate of the Federal Securities Market Commission of the 1.0 series. (head of the top, middle level, controller and specialist of the organization carrying out brokerage, dealer activities), 19.02.2004;
- MICEX Stock Exchange Trader's Certificate, 02.11.2005;
- certificate of the International Moscow Financial and Banking School (training program for traders in working with corporate securities), 25.11.2005;
- Advanced training "Marketing analysis of the bank's customers and products;
- Training on calculations of sales efficiency and profitability of individual products of the bank, their promotion. Operational Marketing, 28.02.2007
2004: KB Sotsgorbank
From 01.03.2004 to 01.07.2011 - OJSC KB Sotsgorbank (the license was canceled in 2017), held positions from a specialist in the stock operations department of the Treasury to the Manager of the Central and Sokol DOs.
2011: Vice President of Interkommerts Design Bureau
From 01.11.2011 to 12.05.2016 - Vice President of Interkommerts Design Bureau (LLC).
2016: Alma Bank
From 05.09.2016 to 17.04.2017 - Managing Director of Operations Department of Alma Bank JSC.
2017: Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of the New Moscow Bank Design Bureau
From 24.04.2017 to 02.07.2017 - Advisor to the Chairman of the Management Board of NMB LLC.
Since 03.07.2017 - Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of NMB LLC.