Gorelov Dmitry Nikolaevich
Content |
Biography
Born in 1971
Education
1993: Kiev Institute of Civil Aviation Engineers
In 1993 he graduated from the Kiev Institute of Civil Aviation Engineers (since 2000 - National Aviation University), specialty - transport organization and management in transport, qualification - engineer in organization and management.
Career
1997: "Bratsk ANKB"
From 03.03.1997 to 31.03.1998 - Head of the Department for Work with Shareholders and Corporate Clients of Bratsk ANKB OJSC.
From 01.04.1998 to 30.04.1998 - Deputy Head of the Settlement and Clearing Department of Bratsk ANKB OJSC
From 01.05.1998 to 11.09.2000 - Head of the Monetary and Economic Department of Bratsk ANKB OJSC.
2000
Deputy. Chairman of the Management Board of Bratsk ANKB
From 12.09.2000 to 24.11.2000 - Deputy Chairman of the Management Board - Head of the Monetary and Economic Department of Bratsk ANKB OJSC.
Bank "MenatepSPB"
From 27.11.2000 to 28.02.2001, he was the chief specialist of the branch of CJSC Bank MenatepSPB (from 2005 - the National Bank TRUST) in Bratsk.
From 01.03.2001 to 30.09.2001, he was the chief manager of the branch of CJSC Bank MenatepSPB in Bratsk.
From 01.10.2001 to 19.10.2001 - Deputy Manager of the branch of OJSC Bank MenatepSPB in Bratsk
2001: Return to Bratsk ANKB
From 24.10.2001 to 13.12.2001 - Head of the Department of Active-Passive Operations of the Moscow Branch of Bratsk ANKB OJSC.
Deputy. Director of the Moscow branch
From 14.12.2001 to 13.06.2002 - Deputy Director of the Moscow Branch of Bratsk ANKB OJSC.
2002: Deputy. Chairman of the board
Since 14.06.2002 - Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of Bratsk ANKB JSC.
2003: Acting Director of Krasnoyarsk Branch
From 01.08.2003 to 15.12.2003 - Acting Director of the Krasnoyarsk branch of Bratsk ANKB OJSC (part-time).
Since 31.10.2003 - Member of the Management Board of Bratsk ANKB JSC.