Content |
Biography
Education
1966: Komsomolsk-on-Amur polytechnical technical school
In 1966 graduated from Komsomolsk-on-Amur polytechnical technical school, specialty: Processing of metals cutting, qualification: technician-technologist.
Career
1992: Director of Grosko
From 1/23/1992 to 4/25/1999 - the Director of Grosko LLP.
1999
CEO "Peter and Paul shipyard"
From 4/26/1999 to 12/22/2003 - the CEO of JSC Petropavlovskaya sudoverf.
Municipal Kamchatprofitbank
From 4/30/1999 to 6/20/2008 - the member of the Supervisory Board of Municipal Kamchatprofitbank Ltd.
2003: Council of People's Deputies of the Kamchatka region
From 12/23/2003 to 3/1/2005 - the Chairman of standing committee on fishing industry and the fleet of Council of People's Deputies of the Kamchatka region.
2005: CEO of Grosko
Since 11/25/2005 - the CEO of LLC JV Grosko.
2012: Municipal Kamchatprofitbank
From 6/26/2012 to 6/24/2014 - the member of the Supervisory Board of Municipal Kamchatprofitbank Ltd.
2014: Chairman of the Supervisory board
Since 6/25/2014 - the Chairman of the Supervisory board of JSC Municipal Kamchatprofitbank.