Content |
Assets
Biography
In 2012, she graduated from Samara state economic the university, an economist in the direction finance of "and." credit In addition to the qualification of an economist English , he is a language translator in the field of professional communication (SSEU, 2012).
2014: "Regional Commercial Bank"
From 20.10.2014 to 30.11.2016 - the leading one saves the credit department of CJSC "Regional Commercial Bank" (since 26.10.2015 - JSC "Regional Commercial Bank").
2017: "Unit Group of Companies"
From 01.08.2017 to 23.04.2018, he was the head of the Corporate Customer Service Department of the UNIT Group of Companies LLC.
2018: NKB Radiotechbank
From 18.05.2018 to 09.04.2019 - Advisor to the Chairman of the Board of PJSC NKB Radiotechbank (license revoked in 2019).
2019
Senior Vice President of Capital Credit Design Bureau
From 20.05.2019 to 22.07.2019 - Senior Vice President of the Office of Management of LLC KB "Capital Credit."
President of KB "Capital Credit"
Since 22.07.2019 - President of the Office of Management of LLC KB "Capital Credit."
Since 17.05.2021 - Member of the Board of Directors of LLC KB "Capital Credit."