Moiseyeva Oksana Viktorovna
Content |
Biography
Education
1986: CCGT
In 1986 graduated from the Perm state university of an award of the Labour Red Banner, the Economist, industry Planning.
1997: MVIPK
From 4/8/1997 to 4/12/1997 completed a "Financial Analysis of Bank for Operational Decision Making" course, the Central interdepartmental institute of advanced training of leading employees and specialists, Moscow.
2000: Russia association
From 7/12/2000 to 7/14/2000 completed a "Credit Policy of Commercial Bank" course, the Russian association of industrial and construction banks "Russia" (since 2017 - Association of regional banks of Russia (Russia Association)), Moscow.
2001: RAGS
From 7/21/2001 to 7/29/2001 attended an educational seminar of leading employees and specialists in the field of banking activity, non-state educational institution the Yulenta center at the Russian Academy of public service under the President of the Russian Federation (since 2010 - the Russian Russian Presidential Academy of National Economy and Public Administration (RANEPA)), Moscow.
Career
2006: "Credit Urals Bank"
Since 3/2/2006 - the board member of KUB Bank of joint stock company.
2008: Vice chairman of the board, chief of Credit management
From 10/1/2008 to 5/31/2009 - the Vice chairman of the board "CUBE" of joint stock company, the chief of Credit management "CUBE" of joint stock company.
2009: Vice chairman of the board
Since 6/1/2009 - the Vice chairman of the board "CUBE" of KUB (JSC) Joint stock company/bank.
2015: ACTING Chairman of the board
From 11/6/2015 to 12/17/2015 - VRIO of the Chairman of the board of KUB (JSC) Bank.
2016: Return to a position of the Vice chairman of the board
Since 1/28/2016 - the Vice chairman of the board of KUB (JSC).
2019: The First Deputy Chairman of the board
1/9/2019 the position is renamed without change of labor function on the First Deputy Chairman of the board of KUB (JSC) Bank.