Motlokhova Yulia Viktorovna
Content |
Biography
Was born on November 20, 1976.
Education
1999: REGIONAL PUBLIC INSTITUTION
In 1999 graduated from the Orenburg state university, specialty - Finance and the credit.
2006: Orenburg institute (branch) of MGYuA
In 2006 graduated from the Orenburg institute (branch) of the Moscow state legal academy of O.E. Kutafin, specialty - Law.
Career
2009: Ministry of natural resources, ecology and property relations of the Orenburg region
From 7/1/2009 to 1/17/2012 - the consultant of Management of monitoring of public sector of economy of the Ministry of natural resources, ecology and the property relations of the Orenburg region.
From 1/18/2012 to 1/14/2015 - the deputy head of department of monitoring of public sector of economy of the Ministry of natural resources, ecology and the property relations of the Orenburg region.
Since 1/15/2015 - the head of department of monitoring of public sector of economy of the Ministry of natural resources, ecology and the property relations of the Orenburg region.
2016
Vice-chairman of Board of Directors Orenburg Bank
Since 5/13/2016 - the Vice-chairman of Board of Directors of JSC Orenburg Bank (it is re-elected: 9/25/2020).
"Corporation of development of the Orenburg region"
Since 5/30/2016 - the board member of JSC Corporation of Development of the Orenburg Region.
2018: "Orenburg state leasing company"
Since 6/29/2018 - the board member of JSC Orenburg State Leasing Company.
2019
"Sanatorium South Ural
Since 4/30/2019 - the board member of Sanatorium Yuzhny Ural LLC.
Orenburgoblprodkontrakt
Since 4/30/2019 - the board member of Orenburgoblprodkontrakt LLC.