Shutko Dyne Ivanovna
Content |
Biography
Was born on November 14, 1959.
Education
1982: Odessa state teacher training college of K.D. Ushinsky
In 1982 graduated from the Odessa state teacher training college of K.D. Ushinsky (since 2009 - the South Ukrainian national pedagogical university of K.D. Ushinsky - YuGPU), qualification - the mathematics teacher and physicists.
1997: Occupational retraining
On July 7, 1997 graduated from the Interregional center of occupational retraining of the military personnel transferred to the reserve Kryvyi Rih, qualification - the economist.
Career
2006: UkrSibBank
From April 25, 2006 to October 17, 2011 - the chief of the Crimean regional department Joint-Stock Commercial Innovation Bank "UkrSibBank".
From October 17, 2011 to May 29, 2014 - the chief of the Crimean regional government of PJSC UkrSibBank.
From May 30, 2014 to November 17, 2014 - the Deputy chief of the Kherson regional government of PJSC UkrSibBank.
2015: "ChBRR bank"
From April 1, 2015 to October 1, 2015 - the adviser to the Chairman of the board of JSC ChBRR Bank.
Chairman of the Supervisory board
From June 27, 2015 to September 23, 2015 - the Chairman of the Supervisory board of JSC ChBRR Bank.
Since September 24, 2015 - the member of the Supervisory board of JSC ChBRR Bank.
Chairman of the board
Since October 1, 2015 - the Chairman of the board of JSC ChBRR Bank.