Content |
Biography
In 1993 she graduated from Ural State University of Economics, specialty "Accounting, control and analysis of economic activities in industry."
2011: Regional Director of Transcapitalbank
From 18.03.2011 to 11.03.2012 - Regional Director of Transcapitalbank (CJSC).
2013: Moscow branch of BKS-Bank
From 10.07.2013 to 01.07.2014 - Deputy Manager for Corporate Business Creditno- Cash Office "Central" (d.) Yekaterinburg Moscow Branch of OJSC "."BCS-Bank
2014: Alliance-Agro Commercial Director
From 01.10.2014 to 30.03.2016 - Commercial Director of Alliance-Agro LLC.
2016: Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of Vyatich Bank
From 19.09.2016 to 09.12.2016 - Head of the Customer Service Department of the Yekaterinburg branch of Vyatich Bank (PJSC) (reg. № 2796/1).
Since 09.12.2016 - Member of the Management Board, Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of Vyatich Bank (PJSC).
Since 15.12.2016 - Manager of the Yekaterinburg branch of Vyatich Bank (PJSC) (reg. № 2796/1).
2019: Acting Chairman of the Management Board of Vyatich Bank
Since 19.12.2019 - Chairman of the Management Board of Vyatich Bank (PJSC)