Ponomaryova Ekaterina Nikolaevna
Person
Content |
Biography
Education
1983: VZFE
In 1983 graduated from All-Union correspondence financial and economic institute, specialty - finance and the credit, qualification - the economist.
Career
2002: "Универсалтраст"
From 8/26/2002 to 5/19/2003 - the chief accountant of LLC CB Universaltrast (the license is revoked in 2012).
2003: JSB Forpost
From 5/20/2003 to 12/13/2006 - the chief accountant - the head of department of accounting and the reporting of Ltd JSB Forpost (the license is revoked in 2006).
2007: CB Novy vek
From 3/1/2007 to 2/1/2009 - the Deputy manager of service of internal control of CB Novy vek (LLC).
From 2/2/2009 to 3/11/2012 - the Head of internal control of CB Novy vek (LLC).
2012: Vice chairman of the board
Since 3/12/2012 - the vice chairman of the board of CB Novy vek (LLC).