Content |
Biography
Education
2001: MIEM
In 2001 graduated from the Moscow state institute of electronics and mathematics (the technical university) (since 2015 - the Moscow institute of electronics and mathematics of Higher School of Economics National Research University), management.
Career
1993: Metrocentre
From 5/26/1993 to 5/31/1999 - the chief of planning department of Metrocentre LLC.
1999: CB Sokolovsky
From 6/1/1999 to 8/2/1999 - the manager of development of the customer base of LLC CB Sokolovsky.
From 8/2/1999 to 4/1/2000 - the specialist of group of a position of department of active and passive transactions of LLC CB Sokolovsky.
From 4/1/2000 to 12/28/2001 - the head of treasury of LLC CB Sokolovsky.
2001: Vice chairman of the board
Since 12/28/2001 - the Vice chairman of the board of JSC CB Sokolovsky.