Content |
Biography
Education
2006: KIBIT
In 2006 ended the Private higher educational institution "Kiev Institute of Business and Technologies" in Finance.
Career
2011: "Volkswagen Bank of RUS"
From 4/18/2011 to 2/25/2013 - the head of Department of maintaining contracts of Volkswagen Bank of RUS LLC.
From 2/26/2013 to 5/9/2016 - the chief of the department on work with partners and corporate clients of Volkswagen Bank of RUS LLC.
From 5/10/2016 to 3/31/2019 - the Head of Department of operational customer service of Volkswagen Bank of RUS LLC.
Since 5/13/2017 - the board member of Volkswagen Bank of RUS LLC.
Since 4/1/2019 - the Head of Department of operational customer service (as combination) Volkswagen Bank of RUS LLC.
Vice chairman of the board
Since 4/1/2019 - the Vice chairman of the board of Volkswagen Bank of RUS LLC.
2016
"FV Group Finants"
Since 5/10/2016 - the Head of Department of operational customer service (in combination) "FV Group Finants" Ltd company.
"RUS FVFU"
Since 5/10/2016 - the Head of Department of operational customer service (in combination) FVFU RUS LLC.