Hubulova Hope Romanovna
Person
Russia
Siberian Federal District of the Russian Federation
Gorno-Altaysk
Financial services, investments and auditing
Siberian Federal District of the Russian Federation
Gorno-Altaysk
Financial services, investments and auditing
Noosphere Bank
Deputy Chairman of the Management Board
Previous jobs:
Realist Bank (formerly BaikalInvestBank)
Managing director
Operations Office
Education of AQIB
Managing director
Operations Office
Education:
Moscow State University of Technology and Management named after K. G. Razumovsky) - 2003
Deputy Chairman of the Management Board
Previous jobs:
Realist Bank (formerly BaikalInvestBank)
Managing director
Operations Office
Education of AQIB
Managing director
Operations Office
Education:
Moscow State University of Technology and Management named after K. G. Razumovsky) - 2003
Content |
Biography
Education
2003: MGTA
In 2003 she graduated from Moscow state the Technological Academy (since 2010 -), Moscow State University of Technology and Management named after K. G. Razumovsky economist manager.
Career
2015: AQIB "Education"
From 14.05.2015 to 16.06.2017, he was the manager of the Smolensky Operations Office of AQIB Education (the license was revoked in 2017).
2017: BaikalInvestBank
From 24.07.2017 to 25.06.2019 - Manager of the Operating Office of Smolensk Branch of BaikalInvesBank JSC in Moscow.
From 24.06.2019 to 05.08.2020, he was the manager of the Smolensk Operations Office of BaikalInvestBank JSC.
2020: Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of Noosphere
From 24.08.2020 to 15.09.2020 - Advisor to the Chairman of the Management Board of Noosphere AKB (JSC).
Since 16.09.2020 - Deputy Chairman of the Board of AKB Noosphere (JSC).