Content |
Biography
Education
MIPT
He graduated from the Moscow Institute of Physics and Technology, qualification: physics engineer, specialty: "physics and mechanics of chemical processes."
1984: Candidate of Technical Sciences
April 18, 1984 awarded the degree - candidate of technical sciences.
Career
2008: General Director of DV-Technologiya
From February 13, 2008 to December 30, 2016 - General Director of ZAO DV-Technologiya.
2017: Axis Consulting
From January 16, 2017 to February 28, 2019 - Advisor to the General Director of Axis Consulting LLC.
2019: Chairman of the Board of Directors of KB "Capital Credit"
From May 15, 2019 to May 27, 2019 - Member of the Board of Directors of LLC KB Stolichny Credit.
Since May 27, 2019 - Chairman of the Board of Directors of LLC KB Stolichny Credit (re-elected in 17.04.2020 for a period of 2 years).