Kurbanchiyev Dzhamaludin Saidovich
Content |
Biography
Born in 18.08.1958
Education
2004: DSTU
In 2004 he graduated from Dagestan State Technical University. Specialty - traffic management. Qualification - engineer.
Career
1997: Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of KB Continental
From 15.10.1997 to 09.06.1998 - Deputy Chairman of the Board of LLC KB Continental.
1998
Dagestan association of bus stations and bus stations
From 06.07.1998 to 01.09.1998 - senior dispatcher of the Dagestan association of bus stations and bus stations.
Commercial Director Ruslan
From 15.09.1998 to 10.04.2000 - Commercial Director of Ruslan LLC, Yuzhno-Sukhokumsk.
2000
"Dagestan Energy Distribution Company"
From 11.04.2000 to 30.11.2000 - Deputy Head of the South Sukhokum Branch of Energy Development (OJSC Dagestan Energy Retail Company).
From 01.12.2000 to 27.07.2020 - Head of the South Sukhokum Branch of Energy Development (OJSC Dagestan Energy Retail Company).
KB Continental
From 26.12.2000 to 18.03.2016 - Member of the Board of Directors of KB Continental LLC.
2016: Chairman of the Board of Directors of KB Continental
Since 19.03.2016 (re-elected 14.12.2019) - Chairman of the Board of Directors of KB Continental LLC.
2020: Dagenergo
Since 28.07.2020 - Head of the South Sukhokum branch of Energetit, the energy distribution branch of the branch of Rosseti North Caucasus Dagenergo PJSC.