Content |
Biography
Was born in 1967.
Education
1990: MIREA
In 1990 graduated from the Moscow institute of radio engineering, electronics and automatic equipment (since 2018 - MIREA - the Russian technology university), specialty applied mathematics, qualification the engineer-mathematician.
2005: FFMS
10/11/2005 of FFMS qualification "The specialist of financial market" in specialization in the field of financial market is appropriated: broker, dealer and securities management.
Career
2007: "First Client Bank"
From 2/1/2007 to 2/29/2012 - the head of department of internal control of share transactions - the controller of The First Client Bank LLC.
From 3/1/2012 to 5/1/2012 - the head of department of internal control of share transactions of management of share transactions of Treasury - the controller of The First Client Bank LLC.
From 5/2/2012 to 9/4/2013 - the head of department of internal control of share transactions - the controller of The First Client Bank LLC.
From 9/5/2013 to 6/17/2014 - a complex controller of Department of internal control of share transactions of The First Client Bank LLC.
From 6/17/2014 to 9/10/2014 - Department of active transactions - the broker of The First Client Bank LLC.
Since 9/10/2014 - the adviser in The First Client Bank LLC.
2019: Chairman of Council of directors
5/30/2019 it is elected the Chairman of the board of directors of The First Client Bank LLC (date of taking office of 5/31/2019).