Pereslegin Andrey Yuryevich
Content |
Biography
In 1998 he graduated from The Russian economic the Academy. G.V. Plekhanov (since 2010 - Russian University of Economics (REU) named after G.V. Plekhanov). Specialty: "," Marketing qualification: economist.
2010: HB Bank (RR)
From April 1, 2010 to March 31, 2011 - Deputy Head of the Monetary and Financial Management of LLC Ach-es-bi-si Bank (RR).
From April 01, 2011 to July 03, 2014 - Deputy Head of the Monetary and Financial Management, Head of the Brokerage Department of H.E.-es-bi-si Bank (RR) LLC.
From July 4, 2014 to July 21, 2015 - Head of the Monetary and Financial Management of LLC "Hour-es-bi-si Bank (RR)."
2015
Deputy Chairman of the Management Board of HB Bank (RR)
Since July 22, 2015 - Deputy Chairman of the Management Board, Head of the Monetary and Financial Management, member of the Management Board of HBC Bank LLC (RR) (re-elected for a new term from March 17, 2020).
Acting Chairman of the Management Board of HB Bank (RR)
From October 1, 2015 to November 8, 2016 - Acting Chairman and Acting Chairman of the Management Board of HBC Bank LLC (RR).
Since May 27, 2019 - Head of the Trade Operations Department of H.E.-es-bi-si Bank (RR) LLC (by combination).